U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Monthey v. Mills County, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • February 11, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • February 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 30, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 29, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • June 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.