U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-mj-00289-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huerta
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 16, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • June 15, 2020: [Supplement to Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 15, 2020: [Exhibit(s)]
  • June 12, 2020: [Detention]
  • June 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
  • June 11, 2020: [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Detention]
  • June 09, 2020: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • June 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.