U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00185
  • Case Name: Whiskey River on Vintage, Inc. et al v. Illinois Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 31, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 02, 2020: [Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 19, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 16, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 16, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 08, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • September 25, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • September 25, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 10, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 02, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 25, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • August 25, 2020: [Leave]
  • August 21, 2020: [Stay]
  • August 20, 2020: [Stay]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 07, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 04, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 24, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • June 18, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 18, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • June 12, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.