U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Krachenfels et al v. Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • February 02, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • February 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 31, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 29, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 18, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 12, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.