U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04017
  • Case Name: Shields v. The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 23, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 07, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.