U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Anderson Tooling, Inc. v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 10, 2020: [Stay]
  • December 09, 2020: [Stay]
  • December 08, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 04, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 08, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • June 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 12, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.