U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Lajeunesse v. Larson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 26, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 16, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • February 08, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • February 05, 2021: [Reconsideration]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 14, 2021: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 19, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • December 09, 2020: [Recusal]
  • December 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • October 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 12, 2020: [Errata]
  • October 12, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 08, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • October 08, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • September 10, 2020: [Compel]
  • September 08, 2020: [Compel]
  • September 04, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 10, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 06, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • August 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 09, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 06, 2020: [Brief /Other]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 30, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.