U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00189
  • Case Name: Carlson v. Vermeer Manufacturing Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 11, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 02, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • September 02, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • August 20, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 19, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 19, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 07, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 07, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 23, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 23, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 17, 2020: [Certificate]
  • July 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 14, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 16, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 15, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.