U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Rickman v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Documents Sent]
  • January 18, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 11, 2022: [Documents Sent]
  • January 07, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 04, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 04, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 17, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 17, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 14, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 14, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 14, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 20, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Transcript]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 02, 2021: [Transcript]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 05, 2021: [Transcript]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 01, 2020: [Transcript]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • November 09, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 13, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice - Other]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 11, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Certificate]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.