U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Adams v. Lawrence Transportation Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • May 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 02, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 28, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • June 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.