U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02039
  • Case Name: General Motors LLC v. KAR Auto Group of Decorah, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Sanctions]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 14, 2022: [Seal]
  • February 11, 2022: [Strike]
  • February 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 03, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 11, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 11, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 11, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 03, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 22, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • October 20, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • October 19, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 12, 2021: [Seal Document]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 03, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Compel]
  • June 11, 2021: [Intervene]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 01, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.