U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Gerleman Management, Inc. et al v. Atlantic States Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 27, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • May 13, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [USCA Order]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 11, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 18, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 17, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 16, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 02, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 16, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • October 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 16, 2020: [Leave]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • October 09, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Bifurcate/Sever]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 05, 2020: [Add Party]
  • August 04, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 16, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 18, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.