U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Bell v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 06, 2021: [Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • June 14, 2021: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • June 14, 2021: [Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 18, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 13, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 07, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 02, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 19, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 19, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.