U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Burge v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Mail Returned]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • December 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • September 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Brief /Other]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.