U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00102
  • Case Name: John S. et al v. Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 18, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 19, 2020: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.