U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Shafer v. Zimmerman Transfer, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • January 26, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • January 25, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • January 24, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 24, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 18, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • January 18, 2022: [Declaration]
  • January 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2021: [Brief /Other]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 18, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2021: [Declaration]
  • November 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 13, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 19, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 17, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • February 16, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • February 12, 2021: [Crossclaim]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 15, 2021: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • January 12, 2021: [Crossclaim]
  • January 12, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 23, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 10, 2020: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 05, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 12, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 02, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 21, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • September 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • September 02, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 02, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 01, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 24, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 10, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 10, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 06, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 06, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 28, 2020: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 28, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 22, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.