U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Sundermann v. Rohlf
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 10, 2022: [Stipulation]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Certify Class]
  • May 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 20, 2020: [Certify Class]
  • November 20, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2020: [Expedite]
  • October 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 05, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2020: [Expedite]
  • October 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 10, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 03, 2020: [Declaration]
  • August 03, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • August 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.