U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03017
  • Case Name: Olson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Withdraw]
  • September 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Expedite]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Compel]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 22, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 13, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 11, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 12, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.