U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Brandon v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • January 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 09, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2020
  • June 28, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 28, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.