U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Byrd v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • January 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • December 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 06, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 28, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 28, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.