U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00203
  • Case Name: Williams v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • September 14, 2020: [Reconsideration]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 20, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • July 16, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.