U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00204
  • Case Name: Hurm v. Bergman Folkers Plastic Surgery et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Public Docket Annotation]
January, 2022
  • January 17, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • January 12, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 07, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 20, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 19, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • May 18, 2021: [Leave]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 15, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 05, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 25, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 20, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.