U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Arias v. Cactus Family Farms, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 15, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • June 11, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • June 04, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 26, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 25, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 25, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • May 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 24, 2021: [Leave]
  • May 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 17, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 17, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • May 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 22, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 21, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 21, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 19, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 25, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Status Report]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 07, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.