U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Hayes et al v Phillips, et al.,
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 30, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 20, 2020: [Affidavit]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 08, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 04, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 09, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 01, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.