U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Blanchard et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice - Other]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 08, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 08, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.