U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Fortney v. Skinner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 28, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • January 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 06, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.