U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00212
  • Case Name: Smith v. Synchrony Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 21, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 15, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 09, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 09, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.