U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00214
  • Case Name: D&M Roofing and Siding, Inc. v. Kool Storage, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 27, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 18, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 21, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 09, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.