U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Risdal v. Turner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 10, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 10, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 10, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.