U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Karadsheh v. Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2021: [Statement]
  • October 11, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Status Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 23, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order]
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 28, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 10, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.