U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Merrill Manufacturing Company vs. Simmons Manufacturing Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 23, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 23, 2020: [Change Venue]
  • September 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 09, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 20, 2020: [Change Venue]
  • August 20, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 19, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 19, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 13, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • July 10, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.