U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04040
  • Case Name: Fischer v. Kujala et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Withdraw]
  • April 05, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 16, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 01, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 15, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.