U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Oral Surgeons, P.C. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 06, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Costs Taxed]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • October 07, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 28, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • September 15, 2020: [Errata]
  • September 15, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • September 10, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 09, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • September 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 12, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • August 06, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 04, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 17, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.