U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 04, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • July 17, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.