U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Finders Keepers, LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • March 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.