U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00225
  • Case Name: Washington v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 01, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 11, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 27, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • May 27, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition]
  • April 18, 2022: [Stay]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 18, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 06, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • April 04, 2022: [Default Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 03, 2022: [Default Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Affidavit in Opposition]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 20, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.