U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00227
  • Case Name: Fugenschuh v. Minnehan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice - Other]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 14, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • December 13, 2021: [Joinder]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 13, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 07, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 06, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 29, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • November 08, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 08, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 02, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 28, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 29, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 28, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.