U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Bonham v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • July 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.