U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00231
  • Case Name: Greek House Chefs v. Kappa Sigma Delta Pi Fraternity et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • October 20, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 20, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2020: [Errata]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • October 12, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 08, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.