U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Adams v. Lawrence Transportation Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 21, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 21, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 18, 2021: [Declaration]
  • June 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • May 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 04, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 01, 2020: [Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • November 23, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order]
  • September 30, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.