U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Welch v. Dempsey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 14, 2022: [Lift Stay]
  • November 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 22, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • November 04, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2021: [In Limine]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 16, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • August 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 13, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 07, 2021: [Sealed Document]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 28, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.