U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00236
  • Case Name: Iowa Network Services Inc. v. CenturyLink Communications, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 12, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 11, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 28, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 28, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 25, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • March 14, 2022: [Stay]
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 25, 2022: [Statement]
  • January 14, 2022: [Stay]
  • January 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Strike]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 13, 2021: [Stay]
  • December 13, 2021: [Strike]
  • December 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Strike]
  • November 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 23, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • November 15, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 12, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • November 10, 2021: [Leave]
  • November 10, 2021: [Seal]
  • November 09, 2021: [Seal]
  • November 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 26, 2021: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • October 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 22, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 21, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 04, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 06, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 02, 2021: [Expedite]
  • July 02, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 01, 2021: [Expedite]
  • July 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 07, 2021: [Stay]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Brief /Other]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 16, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 12, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 02, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • October 09, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 13, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 12, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • August 04, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 03, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.