U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Weiss v. Larson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • March 03, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • February 21, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 21, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 06, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 03, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.