U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00071
  • Case Name: IsoNova Technologies LLC v. Rettig et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Seal]
  • January 13, 2023: [Seal]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 18, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 18, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Compel]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2022: [Compel]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Intervene]
  • February 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 17, 2021: [Quash]
  • December 17, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Expedite]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Strike]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 12, 2021: [Compel]
  • July 09, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • July 02, 2021: [Compel]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Protective Order]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 06, 2021: [Compel]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 03, 2021: [Strike]
  • March 02, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 16, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 19, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Extension of Time]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 05, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.