U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Cervantes v. CRST International, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Strike]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [Seal Document]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 06, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 15, 2021: [Certify Class]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 13, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 13, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 05, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 23, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 23, 2020: [Certify Class]
  • October 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 07, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.