U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00251
  • Case Name: Sellman v. Mass et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 12, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 19, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 17, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order]
  • December 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 30, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 22, 2020: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2020: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • October 01, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.