U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00253
  • Case Name: Rodish v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.