U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cv-00014
  • Case Name: United States of America v. McCrory
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment (Sealed)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 14, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 12, 2020: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.