U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00256
  • Case Name: RSV Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Society Insurance
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 15, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 07, 2020: [Stay]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 01, 2020: [Reply]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 14, 2020: [Stay]
  • September 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 14, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 12, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.