U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00257
  • Case Name: Principal Securities, Inc. v. Agarwal et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Transcript]
  • November 04, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 01, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Status Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 04, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • August 14, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 14, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 13, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.